Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 74 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7815 Week
» 28257 Month
» 365103 Year
» 1586668 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1829 m/e 06/1924
British Railways 31829 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/01/1964
Scrapping During 04/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1924
ELH Eastleigh on 01/01/1948
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 09/09/1950
73B Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 27/06/1951
75A Brighton 5w/e 02/07/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 05/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 09/10/1950
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 25/06/1962
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1924 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1829
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31829    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
05/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31829    

prev prev