Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 808 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 808 Week
» 12101 Month
» 276734 Year
» 1498299 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1833 m/e 07/1924
BR 31833 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sun 23/02/1964
Scrapping During 04/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 7 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1924
EXJ Exmouth Junction on 01/01/1948
75A Brighton 4w/e 22/10/1962
70C Guildford m/e 06/01/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 23/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 22/10/1962
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 29/12/1963
WDN   w/e 23/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/07/1961 Ashford Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 31263, 31621/5, 31804/33/58, 31905/12, 33011/16, 80038 ; being cut up-31575, 32563. Works Yard: 30904/14/29/33/8, 31162, 31247/56, 31507, 31720/59/80, also 30932/9 and 32410/565; SLS/196109
15/02/1964 Worcester Works 1445 (85C), 4992 (82B), 6846 (82E), 7926 (85A), 8405 (85D), 73003 (82E). SLS/196403
23/02/1964 Southern Withdrawals With the exception of 33007, these engines (33007, 31833, 35002/15) are to remain at depots and not to be moved or used until notice for movement is given. SLS/196403

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1924 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1833
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31833    
22/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
06/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
23/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31833    

prev prev