Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 817 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 817 Week
» 12110 Month
» 276743 Year
» 1498308 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1836 m/e 07/1924
BR 31836 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1924
Withdrawal Sat 28/12/1963
Scrapping During 04/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1924
EXJ Exmouth Junction on 01/01/1948
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/11/1950
   Withdrawn on 28/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SAL Salisbury 8w/e 08/01/1949
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 30/11/1950
WDN   on 28/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1924 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1836
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31836    
13/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
28/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31836    

prev prev