Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 738 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5846 Week
» 35344 Month
» 372190 Year
» 1593755 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1837 m/e 07/1924
British Railways 31837 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1924
Withdrawal Mon 07/09/1964
Scrapping During 11/1964
Service Life 40 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1924
EXJ Exmouth Junction on 01/01/1948
72C Yeovil Town 5w/e 11/12/1952
72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 14/02/1953
   Withdrawn on 07/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72C Yeovil Town 9w/e 11/12/1952
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 03/03/1953
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/01/1951 Ashford Works New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. SLS/195102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1924 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1837
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31837    
11/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (72C)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
07/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31837    

prev prev