Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 388 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18191 Week
» 71207 Month
» 190734 Year
» 3217587 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1838 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
British Railways |
31838 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Mongolipers |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 07/1924 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 14/02/1964 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 7 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1964 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1924 |
EXJ |
|
Exmouth Junction |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/02/1964 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
24/02/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/01/1950 |
Ashford Works |
Locomotives in Works on 3/1 included Nos. 1266/67/93, 1309/24, 1553, 31610. 1623/72, 31729, 1783/93, 31806, 1807, 31831/63, 1864. Locomotives ex Works (late December-early January) painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 31145, 31811/38, 32465. 32585. 'D.3' No. 32380 is expected to appear in lined black, as also have Nos. 32388/93 recently, so it would appear that complete extinction of this class is not at present contemplated. |
SLS/195002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1924 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1838 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31838 |
|
|
14/02/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31838 |
|
|
03/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|