Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 741 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5849 Week
» 35347 Month
» 372193 Year
» 1593758 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1838 m/e 07/1924
British Railways 31838 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1924
Withdrawal Fri 14/02/1964
Scrapping During 03/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 7 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1924
EXJ Exmouth Junction on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 14/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   4w/e 24/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/01/1950 Ashford Works Locomotives in Works on 3/1 included Nos. 1266/67/93, 1309/24, 1553, 31610. 1623/72, 31729, 1783/93, 31806, 1807, 31831/63, 1864. Locomotives ex Works (late December-early January) painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 31145, 31811/38, 32465. 32585. 'D.3' No. 32380 is expected to appear in lined black, as also have Nos. 32388/93 recently, so it would appear that complete extinction of this class is not at present contemplated. SLS/195002

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1924 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1838
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31838    
14/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31838    

prev prev