Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 717 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4233 Week
» 32191 Month
» 66833 Year
» 1288398 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1843 m/e 08/1924
BR 31843 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1924
Withdrawal 3w/e Mon 14/09/1964
Scrapping During 11/1964
Service Life 40 yrs, 1 mth , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
RED Redhill 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
RED Redhill 4w/e 30/06/1949
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 05/02/1951
72E Barnstaple Junction 5w/e 11/12/1952
72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 17/11/1956
   Withdrawn 3w/e 14/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RED Redhill 5w/e 11/08/1947
ALLOC AFD Ashford 9w/e 01/08/1948
ALLOC RED Redhill 4w/e 30/06/1949
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 72E Barnstaple Junction 9w/e 11/12/1952
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 17/11/1956
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1924 To Service To service as SR Number 1843
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31843    
30/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (RED)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
11/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31843    

prev prev