Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 827 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 827 Week
» 12120 Month
» 276753 Year
» 1498318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1844 m/e 08/1924
BR 31844 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1924
Withdrawal Sat 28/12/1963
Scrapping During 04/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 4 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1924
NORW Norwood Junction on 01/01/1948
RED Redhill 4w/e 30/06/1949
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 05/02/1951
71D Fratton 6w/e 13/08/1952
72E Barnstaple Junction 8w/e 20/07/1953
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 01/10/1953
   Withdrawn on 28/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC AFD Ashford 9w/e 01/08/1948
ALLOC RED Redhill 4w/e 30/06/1949
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 71D Fratton 2w/e 13/08/1952
ALLOC 72E Barnstaple Junction 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 01/10/1953
WDN   4w/e 31/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1924 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1844
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31844    
30/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (RED)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
13/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
31/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31844    

prev prev