Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 764 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5872 Week
» 35370 Month
» 372216 Year
» 1593781 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1845 m/e 09/1924
British Railways 31845 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 09/1924
Withdrawal Mon 07/09/1964
Scrapping During 01/1965
Service Life 40 yrs , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1924
EXJ Exmouth Junction on 01/01/1948
72E Barnstaple Junction 8w/e 20/07/1953
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 01/10/1953
   Withdrawn on 07/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72E Barnstaple Junction 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 01/10/1953
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1924 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1845
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31845    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
07/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31845    

prev prev