Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 41 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7782 Week
» 28224 Month
» 365070 Year
» 1586635 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1846 m/e 09/1924
British Railways 31846 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 09/1924
Withdrawal Mon 07/09/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 40 yrs , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1924
SAL Salisbury on 01/01/1948
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/11/1950
   Withdrawn on 07/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 30/11/1950
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/09/1963 Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: 30073, 30824, 33037, 34006/15/21/33/41/51, 34043 partially cut up, 35014/7/8/25/7, 41316/24, 73049/51, 75069, 76010/28/68, 80015/31/42/82, D3668, D4100, D6536/45, E5007, E6001. Test House: 31834. Scrap Yard: 30510, 30911. Works Yard: 35010, WD601 ex works, 31400, 31846, 34036 damaged front end, 34055 (with smoke-box door from 34043), 35029, 73110 (all waiting works), 30915, 31818, 32338, 32635/61 waiting scrap. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1924 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1846
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31846    
13/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
07/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31846    

prev prev