Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 44 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7785 Week
» 28227 Month
» 365073 Year
» 1586638 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1849 m/e 02/1925
British Railways 31849 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 02/1925
Withdrawal Mon 13/07/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1925
RED Redhill on 01/01/1948
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 11/04/1951
   Withdrawn on 13/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RED Redhill m/e 30/11/1946
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/04/1951
WDN   w/e 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/08/1949 Ashford Works Ex Works: Class 'N' Nos. 31407, 31828/49, Class 'H.1' 31904 and DIE No. 15221. Yard shunting was performed by D/E No. 15220 and 'R.1' No. 31069. DIE Nos. 15222/23 are well forward, also a diesel-mechanical unit-Nos. 15224/25 will complete the current order, though it is believed a further lot are contemplated. The last 'F.1' No. 1231 was still intact and other engines in the yard were Nos. 1039/80, 1128, 1238/57, 31268, 1302/11, 31532, 1575, 31662, 1698, 31759, 31805, 1824/80, 31857/93, 1897, 1906, 31907, 1913/14, 2393, 2401/06/34/56/63/68, 2515/26/40, 33032, 34069. An interesting occupant of the shed was 'Terrier' K. & E.S.R, No. KES3. SLS/194909
26/10/1951 Brighton Works New construction, 80021 well advanced, laid down to 80027, Under repair, DS1173, 377S, 15217, 20002, 31638, 31849, 31853, 32168, 32376, 32464, 32479, 42101. Being cut up, 32590. Waiting scrapping, 32075, 32021. Nos. 31849/53 bear R.O.F. Nos. 26 and 29 respectively. Recently ex shops: 80019 (20/10) for S.R.; 80020 (27/10) for Sc.R.; 31691 (26/10); 80013 and others of the class after attention to leaky tanks. An unusual visitor to Brighton shed is 30163 (L.11); 32347 with damaged front end is understood to be waiting decision as to repair or scrap. No. 41297 was on shed on 7th November. SLS/195112

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1849
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31849    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
13/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31849    

prev prev