Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 751 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5859 Week
» 35357 Month
» 372203 Year
» 1593768 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1850 m/e 02/1925
British Railways 31850 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 02/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/01/1964
Scrapping During 07/1964 at Cohens (at Redhill Depot)
Service Life 38 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1925
RDG Reading (S.R.) on 01/01/1948
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 14/06/1959
75B Redhill 5w/e 26/11/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 05/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FAV Faversham 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 75B Redhill P 26/11/1959
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/12/1948 Ashford Works Locomotives recently painted black and fully lined include Nos. 30520, 30916, 31005, 31507/95, 31765/74, 31804/50/68. SLS/194901

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1850
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Reading (S.R.) (RDG)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31850    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
26/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
05/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31850    

prev prev