Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 881 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4741 Week
» 7323 Month
» 271956 Year
» 1493521 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1851 m/e 02/1925
BR 31851 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 02/1925
Withdrawal During 09/1963
Scrapping During 05/1964
Service Life 38 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1925
RED Redhill 01/01/1948
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 11/04/1951
71D Fratton 4w/e 06/10/1951
72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 20/07/1953
73B Bricklayers Arms 9w/e 08/02/1955
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 14/06/1959
75B Redhill 5w/e 26/11/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RED Redhill 5w/e 11/08/1947
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 71D Fratton 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 08/02/1955
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 75B Redhill P 26/11/1959
WDN   w/e 25/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/03/1951 Brighton Works New 2-6-4T No. 42687 came of works on 16th March. In shops were 15211/5, 31036 (? for scrap), 31696 (? for scrap), 31851 (works No. R.O.F. 35), 31892, 32422 (lined black), 32506 (lined black), 32518, 32570, 31635: new tanks are due off 42088 (29/3), 42089 (9/4), 42090 (17/4). It is understood that 'I.3' No. 32077 and a Wainwright 4-4-0 outside works are for scrap. SLS/195104
25/02/1962 Ashford Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 31638, 31828/51/62/95. Works Yard: 30804/52, 30900/9/15, 31317, 31584, 31717, 31830/42/66/75, 32416. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1851
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31851    
11/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
08/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
26/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31851    

prev prev