Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 782 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4642 Week
» 7224 Month
» 271857 Year
» 1493422 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1853 m/e 04/1925
BR 31853 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1925
Withdrawal 3w/e Mon 14/09/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1925
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 06/10/1951
73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 13/10/1958
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 14/06/1959
   Withdrawn 3w/e 14/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 2w/e 13/10/1958
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction P 14/06/1959
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/01/1951 Ashford Works New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. SLS/195102
26/10/1951 Brighton Works New construction, 80021 well advanced, laid down to 80027, Under repair, DS1173, 377S, 15217, 20002, 31638, 31849, 31853, 32168, 32376, 32464, 32479, 42101. Being cut up, 32590. Waiting scrapping, 32075, 32021. Nos. 31849/53 bear R.O.F. Nos. 26 and 29 respectively. Recently ex shops: 80019 (20/10) for S.R.; 80020 (27/10) for Sc.R.; 31691 (26/10); 80013 and others of the class after attention to leaky tanks. An unusual visitor to Brighton shed is 30163 (L.11); 32347 with damaged front end is understood to be waiting decision as to repair or scrap. No. 41297 was on shed on 7th November. SLS/195112
12/05/1963 Eastligh MPD (Ex Works) Waiting Works: DS682, 30031/65/70/89, 30105/10/99, 30328, 30513/39, 30936, 31612, 31861/6, 31906/8/9, 32503, 33009, 34046/84, 35012, 76013/4. Ex Works: D6527, 31803/53, 35004, 82023. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1853
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31853    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
13/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
14/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31853    

prev prev