Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 324 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 324 Week
» 7508 Month
» 315489 Year
» 1199870 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1853 m/e 04/1925
BR 31853 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1925
Withdrawal 3w/e Mon 14/09/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 06/10/1951
73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 13/10/1958
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 14/06/1959
   Withdrawn 3w/e 14/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 2w/e 13/10/1958
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction P 14/06/1959
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1925 To Service To service as SR Number 1853
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31853    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
13/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31853    

prev prev