Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 712 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 2051 Week
» 31549 Month
» 368395 Year
» 1589960 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1854 m/e 03/1925
British Railways 31854 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1925
Withdrawal Mon 15/06/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 39 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1925
RDG Reading (S.R.) on 01/01/1948
73C Hither Green 4w/e 06/11/1954
74A Ashford 5w/e 19/07/1957
73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 26/05/1961
72A Exmouth Junction on 11/08/1963
   Withdrawn on 15/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RED Redhill 5w/e 11/08/1947
ALLOC RDG Reading (S.R.) P 02/01/1948
ALLOC FAV Faversham 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 74A Ashford 5w/e 19/07/1957
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 31/08/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 22/06/1964
TOSTORE   3w/e 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1854
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Reading (S.R.) (RDG)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31854    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
19/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
11/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
15/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31854    

prev prev