Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1575 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19378 Week
» 72394 Month
» 191921 Year
» 3218774 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1854 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
British Railways |
31854 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Mongolipers |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 03/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 15/06/1964 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1925 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1854 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Reading (S.R.) (RDG) |
|
|
02/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (RDG) |
|
|
01/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (FAV) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31854 |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
19/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
11/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
15/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31854 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |
|
|