Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 8 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5352 Week
» 6242 Month
» 314223 Year
» 1198604 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1855 m/e 03/1925
BR 31855 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1925
Withdrawal 3w/e Mon 14/09/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 6 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 06/10/1951
73C Hither Green 6w/e 18/06/1954
72A Exmouth Junction m/e 10/02/1961
   Withdrawn 3w/e 14/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 6w/e 22/06/1954
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 10/02/1961
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1925 To Service To service as SR Number 1855
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31855    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
18/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31855    

prev prev