Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 790 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4650 Week
» 7232 Month
» 271865 Year
» 1493430 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1856 m/e 03/1925
BR 31856 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1925
Withdrawal During 07/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 4 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1925
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948
73C Hither Green 4w/e 06/10/1951
70C Guildford 5w/e 14/02/1953
75B Redhill 4w/e 26/05/1953
73C Hither Green 8w/e 20/07/1953
72A Exmouth Junction m/e 10/02/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 70C Guildford 8w/e 03/03/1953
ALLOC 75B Redhill 9w/e 26/05/1953
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 10/02/1961
TOSTORE   3w/e 29/06/1964
WDN   w/e 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1856
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31856    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
26/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31856    

prev prev