Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 693 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 693 Week
» 11986 Month
» 276619 Year
» 1498184 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1857 m/e 04/1925
BR 31857 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/01/1964
Scrapping During 02/1964
Service Life 38 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1925
RDG Reading (S.R.) on 01/01/1948
73C Hither Green 4w/e 27/07/1951
70B Feltham 8w/e 17/01/1961
72A Exmouth Junction m/e 10/02/1961
70C Guildford 4w/e 22/10/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 05/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 70B Feltham 8w/e 17/01/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 22/10/1962
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/08/1949 Ashford Works Ex Works: Class 'N' Nos. 31407, 31828/49, Class 'H.1' 31904 and DIE No. 15221. Yard shunting was performed by D/E No. 15220 and 'R.1' No. 31069. DIE Nos. 15222/23 are well forward, also a diesel-mechanical unit-Nos. 15224/25 will complete the current order, though it is believed a further lot are contemplated. The last 'F.1' No. 1231 was still intact and other engines in the yard were Nos. 1039/80, 1128, 1238/57, 31268, 1302/11, 31532, 1575, 31662, 1698, 31759, 31805, 1824/80, 31857/93, 1897, 1906, 31907, 1913/14, 2393, 2401/06/34/56/63/68, 2515/26/40, 33032, 34069. An interesting occupant of the shed was 'Terrier' K. & E.S.R, No. KES3. SLS/194909

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1857
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Reading (S.R.) (RDG)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31857    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
17/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
22/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
05/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31857    

prev prev