Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 733 Today
» 1339 Yesterday
» 2072 Week
» 31570 Month
» 368416 Year
» 1589981 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1858 m/e 05/1925
British Railways 31858 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sun 26/12/1965
Scrapping During 05/1966
Service Life 40 yrs, 7 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1925
RED Redhill on 01/01/1948
73C Hither Green 4w/e 27/07/1951
70C Guildford 6w/e 22/10/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 26/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RED Redhill 5w/e 11/08/1947
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 70C Guildford 9w/e 22/10/1959
WDN   w/e 26/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/07/1961 Ashford Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 31263, 31621/5, 31804/33/58, 31905/12, 33011/16, 80038 ; being cut up-31575, 32563. Works Yard: 30904/14/29/33/8, 31162, 31247/56, 31507, 31720/59/80, also 30932/9 and 32410/565; SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1858
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31858    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
22/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
26/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 31858    

prev prev