Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 804 Today
» 1296 Yesterday
» 5912 Week
» 35410 Month
» 372256 Year
» 1593821 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1859 m/e 04/1925
British Railways 31859 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1925
Withdrawal Mon 07/09/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 39 yrs, 5 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1925
TON Tonbridge on 01/01/1948
74C Dover Marine 4w/e 08/12/1950
73C Hither Green 4w/e 27/07/1951
75C Norwood Junction 3w/e 26/05/1961
75A Brighton 5w/e 06/07/1961
70C Guildford m/e 08/12/1961
72A Exmouth Junction 2w/e 31/08/1963
   Withdrawn on 07/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TON Tonbridge 8w/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC RED Redhill 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 74B Ramsgate m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 75A Brighton 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 08/12/1961
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 31/08/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/05/1963 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1859
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31859    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C)    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
06/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
08/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
07/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31859    

prev prev