Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 488 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 1737 Week
» 22179 Month
» 359025 Year
» 1580590 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1860 m/e 04/1925
British Railways 31860 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1925
Withdrawal 5w/e Sat 02/11/1963
Scrapping During 02/1964
Service Life 38 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1925
RDG Reading (S.R.) on 01/01/1948
74A Ashford 4w/e 17/06/1950
75B Redhill 4w/e 05/02/1951
73C Hither Green 4w/e 27/07/1951
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 14/06/1959
   Withdrawn 5w/e 02/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 74A Ashford 3w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 74A Ashford 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction P 14/06/1959
WDN   5w/e 02/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1860
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Reading (S.R.) (RDG)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31860    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
02/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31860    

prev prev