Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 98 Today
» 1224 Yesterday
» 3910 Week
» 33408 Month
» 370254 Year
» 1591819 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1862 m/e 05/1925
British Railways 31862 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sun 11/04/1965
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 39 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1925
TON Tonbridge on 01/01/1948
73C Hither Green 4w/e 27/07/1951
70C Guildford 5w/e 14/02/1953
75B Redhill 4w/e 26/05/1953
70C Guildford 4w/e 18/01/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 11/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC AFD Ashford 8w/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC TON Tonbridge m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC RED Redhill 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 70C Guildford 8w/e 03/03/1953
ALLOC 75B Redhill 9w/e 26/05/1953
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 18/01/1965
WDN   w/e 11/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/03/1951 Ashford Works (In shops) In shops: 1107, 31245 (late s1245), s1274, 31287, 31329, 31413, 31510, 31812/26/62, 31900/23/25, 32372 (new cyls.), 32502 (lined black), s2473 (being renumbered), 32467, 32525/65, 78597, 90226, 33039. In yard: s1178, 1335, 31789 (green), 31897, 33025, 31616, 31848. On shed for works 1174, 31408, 31461, 32486 (and 30793 for ELH). Scrap: 1157, 31160 (partly cut up), 1547, 1730, 31743, 31502, 32402, and being cut up 1443 an 32301. Building Shunting diesel-electric 15228-30 and a main-line diesel 10203. Twenty sets of frames for 4-6-2 to be built at Crewe, also many sets of all-welded side tanks for new B.R. standard 2-6-4T to be built at Brighton. Noted not renumbered: 1041, 1271, 1339, 1379. Ex shops 32523 (1 dome), 31405, 31785 (green), 31521, and lined black 31401 an 31825 (late s1825) SLS/195108
25/02/1962 Ashford Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 31638, 31828/51/62/95. Works Yard: 30804/52, 30900/9/15, 31317, 31584, 31717, 31830/42/66/75, 32416. SLS/196204
12/05/1963 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1862
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31862    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
26/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
18/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
11/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 31862    

prev prev