Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 772 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 772 Week
» 12065 Month
» 276698 Year
» 1498263 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1864 m/e 06/1925
BR 31864 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/01/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 38 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1925
RED Redhill on 01/01/1948
70B Feltham 5w/e 14/02/1953
75B Redhill 4w/e 26/05/1953
   Withdrawn w/e 05/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75B Redhill 9w/e 26/05/1953
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/01/1950 Ashford Works Locomotives in Works on 3/1 included Nos. 1266/67/93, 1309/24, 1553, 31610. 1623/72, 31729, 1783/93, 31806, 1807, 31831/63, 1864. Locomotives ex Works (late December-early January) painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 31145, 31811/38, 32465. 32585. 'D.3' No. 32380 is expected to appear in lined black, as also have Nos. 32388/93 recently, so it would appear that complete extinction of this class is not at present contemplated. SLS/195002

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1925 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1864
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31864    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
26/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
05/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31864    

prev prev