Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 98 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5735 Week
» 18839 Month
» 18839 Year
» 1240404 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1872 m/e 08/1925
BR 31872 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sun 26/05/1963
Scrapping During 08/1963
Service Life 37 yrs, 9 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SAL Salisbury 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73B Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 27/06/1951
75B Redhill 6w/e 14/06/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 26/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 75B Redhill P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 26/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1925 To Service To service as SR Number 1872
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31872    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31872    

prev prev