Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 762 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3448 Week
» 4338 Month
» 312319 Year
» 1196700 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1874 m/e 09/1925
BR 31874 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 09/1925
Withdrawal 5w/e Mon 30/03/1964
Service Life 38 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72B Salisbury 4w/e 08/12/1950
73C Hither Green 7w/e 27/06/1951
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 27/07/1951
72A Exmouth Junction m/e 10/02/1961
   Withdrawn 5w/e 30/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction P 02/01/1948
ALLOC PLY Plymouth Friary 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 5w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC 72B Salisbury m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 10/02/1961
WDN   5w/e 30/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1925 To Service To service as SR Number 1874
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31874    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31874    

prev prev