Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 235 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5579 Week
» 6469 Month
» 314450 Year
» 1198831 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1875 m/e 08/1925
BR 31875 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1925
Withdrawal 3w/e Mon 10/08/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 39 yrs , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72B Salisbury 4w/e 08/12/1950
73C Hither Green 7w/e 27/06/1951
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 27/07/1951
72A Exmouth Junction m/e 10/02/1961
   Withdrawn 3w/e 10/08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PLY Plymouth Friary 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC EXJ Exmouth Junction 5w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC 72B Salisbury m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 10/02/1961
WDN   3w/e 10/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1925 To Service To service as SR Number 1875
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31875    
08/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Salisbury (72B)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
25/02/1961 Sightings Ashford Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.   Link
08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31875    
12/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev