Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 129 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17932 Week
» 70948 Month
» 190475 Year
» 3217328 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1896 |
m/e |
03/1931 |
British Railways |
31896 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
U Boats |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 03/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 30/12/1962 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1931 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1896 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31896 |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
09/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
01/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
10/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
02/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D) |
|
|
30/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31896 |
|
|
05/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|