Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 766 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4282 Week
» 32240 Month
» 66882 Year
» 1288447 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1901 m/e 06/1931
BR 31901 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 06/1931
Withdrawal w/e Sun 30/06/1963
Scrapping During 08/1963
Service Life 32 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BA Bricklayers Arms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 27/06/1951
75A Brighton 4w/e 11/12/1954
73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 21/06/1955
73J Tonbridge 6w/e 14/06/1959
72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 26/05/1961
75C Norwood Junction 2w/e 10/10/1961
75A Brighton 4w/e 17/12/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 30/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BA Bricklayers Arms P 02/01/1948
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 11/12/1954
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 75A Brighton P 17/12/1962
WDN   w/e 30/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1931 To Service To service as SR Number 1901
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31901    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
27/07/1954 Sightings Ashford Works visit: Around the works. - In yard, for repairs. RO 9/1954 Link
11/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
10/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
17/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31901    

prev prev