Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 94 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 3693 Week
» 9827 Month
» 237711 Year
» 1459276 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1902 m/e 07/1931
BR 31902 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 07/1931
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962
Scrapping During 01/1963
Service Life 31 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1931
BA Bricklayers Arms 01/01/1948
73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 27/06/1951
75A Brighton 4w/e 11/12/1954
73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 21/06/1955
73J Tonbridge 6w/e 14/06/1959
72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 26/05/1961
75C Norwood Junction 2w/e 10/10/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BA Bricklayers Arms P 02/01/1948
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 27/06/1951
TOSTORE UNK   10w/e 07/10/1952
TOSTORE 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 08/01/1953
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 27/03/1953
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 11/12/1954
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 04/06/1955
TOSTORE 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 10/10/1955
REINS 73B Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 26/05/1961
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during April included: 1036, 1086, 1256, 1267, 1276, 1400, 1490, 1503, 1512, 1587, 1902, 1908, 2374, 2402, 2435, 2448, 2457, 2460, 2473, 2573, 2580, 2589, 21C123, 21C125, 21C130, 21C132, W.D. 77296 and 78666. W.D. 70853 and 77103 have been turned out painted black with standard S.R. numerals on buffer, cab sides and back of tender. SLS/194706
06/11/1959 Southern Region floods 4th-6/11/1959. Unique in that on the second day (Sat., Nov. 5th) as far as possible a half-hourly service was operated such as only scheduled or attempted with electric multiple-units introduced in 1935, was the emergency steam working between Brighton and Eastbourne calling at intermediate stations, on account of severe flooding through the two-sided junction station at the county town, Lewes, necessitating withdrawal of all electric trains for 2 or more days on the Brighton side; for more than a week on the Haywards Heath-London side. It was not possible for the steam locOrnotives as a rule to keep intermediate timings but it was a great effort by all concerned over steep gradients 'twixt Lewes and Brighton under hazardous conditions, for instance. Saturday loads were 4-5 bogies though on Friday with fewer trains up to 8-9 modern coaches were hauled on some trips presenting a tough proposition as the engines were of a mixed character with crews hastily gathered together. Some complete outfits were from the Brighton-Uckfield (Tunbridge Wells) route closed temporarily by other flooding. Mr. S. C. Nash kindly supplied the following list of locomotives sharing in the handling of the emergency passenger service, Nov. 4th-6th :- Tender: 34098 'West Country'; 30546, 'Q', 31686, 31724, 'C', 0-6-0s; 31825, 'N', 31902/7, 'Ul', 32337/41-2, 'K' ex-L.B.S.C.R., 2.6-0s; 75075, B.R. class 4 4-6-0. Tank: 30053/6 'M7' ex-L.S.W.R. motor fitted, also partly on Seaford branch; 80032/81/146/7/52-4, B.R. class 4 2-6-4T. There were also part time two Hastings-London 6-car diesel-electric sets having greater accelerative capacity. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1931 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1902
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31902    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
11/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
10/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31902    

prev prev