Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 771 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4287 Week
» 32245 Month
» 66887 Year
» 1288452 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1904 m/e 07/1931
BR 31904 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class U Boats
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 07/1931
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/11/1962
Scrapping During 01/1963
Service Life 31 yrs, 4 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAT Stewarts Lane 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 17/06/1950
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 05/02/1951
73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 27/06/1951
73J Tonbridge 6w/e 14/06/1959
72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 26/05/1961
75C Norwood Junction 2w/e 10/10/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 24/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FAV Faversham 5w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 12/03/1949
ALLOC BTN Brighton 6w/e 12/12/1949
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 27/06/1951
TOSTORE UNK   10w/e 07/10/1952
TOSTORE 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 08/01/1953
REINS 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 27/03/1953
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 26/05/1961
WDN   w/e 24/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1931 To Service To service as SR Number 1904
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31904    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
10/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
24/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31904    

prev prev