Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 1331 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19134 Week
» 72150 Month
» 191677 Year
» 3218530 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1912 |
m/e |
01/1932 |
British Railways |
31912 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
W |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 01/1932 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 30/08/1964 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/07/1961 |
Ashford Works (Erecting Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 31263, 31621/5, 31804/33/58, 31905/12, 33011/16, 80038 ; being cut up-31575, 32563. Works Yard: 30904/14/29/33/8, 31162, 31247/56, 31507, 31720/59/80, also 30932/9 and 32410/565; |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1932 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1912 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31912 |
|
|
24/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
19/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
06/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
30/08/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31912 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|