|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/09/1963 | Eastleigh MPD (Waiting Works or scrap) | Ex Works on 71A-DS238 (ex-30070 named Wainwright), 34030, 34102, 41290/5, 76007, D3719. Waiting Works or scrap on 71A-30065/89, 30199, 30241, 30346/68, 30500/3/11/5/6/9/48/86, 30911/30/6, 31403/13, 31637, 31794, 31810/20/79/80/90/8/9, 31900/3/5/6/10/6/21/3, 32353, 32417, 32557, 33011/21, 34023/35/71/4, 41312, 73054. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1935 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 1916 Built at Ashford Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW) | ||
05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 31916 | ||
14/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) | ||
26/05/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) | ||
20/07/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 31916 | ||
10/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |