Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 599 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14005 Week
» 67021 Month
» 186548 Year
» 3213401 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1920 |
m/e |
08/1935 |
British Railways |
31920 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
W |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 08/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 07/07/1963 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 11 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
07/07/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/02/1948 |
Brighton Station |
Unusual visitors to Brighton on 9/2 were Nos. 1918/20; 'W' tanks are not often seen there. Some half-dozen Eastern Section engines appear during the course of a week, especially on the through train from Sevenoaks due 8.24 a.m. (frequently an 'H' tank) and on the through from Tonbridge due 9.10 a.m. on which 'D' and 'Dl' classes appear (Nos. 1591, 1731, 1745, etc.). Otherwise the steam working is in the hands of the usual Central Section engines apart from Standard classes built since 1922, such as 'V,' 'N,' 'Ul,' and the two 'P' class tanks which are used for Kingston Wharf and shed coal stage duties |
SLS/194803 |
16/06/1951 |
Brighton Works |
On 16th June, the shops contained s1, 15212, 31470, 31801, 31920, 32343, 32442, 32501/7, 32557 all under repair, remains of 32145 an 2063, while 32005 is next for scrap (possibly to be followed by 2595, which was at the shed). New 2-6-4T No. 80010 was well advanced and four more should be finished by mid-August. Boilers are numbered BR5-896 upwards and are pressed to 225lb. Now that No. 2063 is cut up, the B4 class is extinct. A small private exhibition of locomotives took place in the Works on 19th June, consisting of 42095, 34040 Crewkerne (both in spotless condition), 15227, and the almost-completed 2-6-4T 80010. On that date the diesel s1 was renumbered 15201, completing the class. |
SLS/195108 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1935 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1920 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (HIT) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31920 |
|
|
07/07/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31920 |
|
|
02/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|