Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3491 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16897 Week
» 69913 Month
» 189440 Year
» 3216293 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1922 |
m/e |
11/1935 |
British Railways |
31922 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
W |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 11/1935 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 25/08/1963 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 9 mths , 25 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1935 |
HIT |
|
Hither Green |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
71A |
|
Eastleigh |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
25/08/1963 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
ALLOC |
70B |
Feltham |
4w/e |
19/11/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
25/08/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1935 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1922 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31922 |
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
25/08/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31922 |
|
|
06/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|