Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 130 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17933 Week
» 70949 Month
» 190476 Year
» 3217329 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2023 |
m/e |
02/1909 |
British Railways |
32023 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Marsh Tanks |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 02/1909 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 28/07/1951 |
Service Life |
42 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1909 |
TWW |
|
Tunbridge Wells West |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
75A |
|
Brighton |
7w/e |
27/06/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
28/07/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
8w/e |
27/06/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/07/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/10/1945 |
Ashford Works |
Locos noted on 27/10 included 0-4-0 Dock Tank 81, 'Jersey,' together with Terrier 2678, both ex-works. The latter has been on loan to. the KESR. 2528 (BTN), 2534 (NHN), 2023/5 (TWW) and 719 (BM) were outside the shed whilst 2072 (NX) was on a down passenger. 1451 with number still on the tender was station pilot. 22 classes in all were represented, excluding those outside the works. |
SLS/194602 |
07/03/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Engines in shops included Nos. 82 Boxhill, 2023/30/37/39/76/89, 2113, S2343, 2449, 32086, 34001 Exeter, 34003/61, 73790, 77056, 77180, 21C107 Wadebridge. |
SLS/194904 |
30/04/1949 |
Brighton Works |
A reconditioned boiler (BE.926) has arrived at Brighton for 'H.1' class locomotive No. 32037 Selsey Bill, now undergoing heavy repair. No. 34065 Hurricane ('B.O.B.' Class) which was about to leave the works in the experimental light green livery, has been repainted in the old S.R. livery with yellow bands. Re-numbered at Brighton: Nos. 32023/30 (6/4); No. 34008 Padstow (8/4); Nos. 32113 an 90527 (ex 77056) (11/4); 32525 an 34009 Lyme Regis (13/4). No. 32151, ex Eastleigh Works, was noted lined out at Brighton shed on 10/4 and on 20/4 No. 31826 was observed here in the same style. |
SLS/194905 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2023 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tunbridge Wells West (TWW) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32023 |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
28/07/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32023 |
|
|
08/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|