Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1600 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15006 Week
» 68022 Month
» 187549 Year
» 3214402 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2077 |
m/e |
10/1910 |
British Railways |
32077 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
Marsh Tanks |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 10/1910 |
Withdrawal |
During 03/1951 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1948 |
Brighton Works |
The following were noted at Brighton in standard black livery, unlined with Gill Sans lettering and smokebox numberplates: Nos. 30425, 30951 (no smokebox numberplate), 32077/84, 32337/44/49, while No. 30806 was in Southern green, with Standard Gill Sans lettering and smokebox numberplate. |
SLS/194811 |
30/09/1949 |
Eastleigh Works |
Locomotives ex Works in late September included: Nos. 35018/25 painted blue, Nos. 30449, 30741, 34061 painted dark green, Nos. 30323, 30730/32, 30905, 32077/86 painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 30458 Ironside, 30840/42, 32085, 90772 are unlined black. In addition to the above, Nos. 35009/17 are painted blue and Nos. 34091-92 are very dark green. |
SLS/194911 |
16/03/1951 |
Brighton Works |
New 2-6-4T No. 42687 came of works on 16th March. In shops were 15211/5, 31036 (? for scrap), 31696 (? for scrap), 31851 (works No. R.O.F. 35), 31892, 32422 (lined black), 32506 (lined black), 32518, 32570, 31635: new tanks are due off 42088 (29/3), 42089 (9/4), 42090 (17/4). It is understood that 'I.3' No. 32077 and a Wainwright 4-4-0 outside works are for scrap. |
SLS/195104 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2077 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32077 |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (EBN) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G) |
|
|
03/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32077 |
|
|
03/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|