Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 349 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 349 Week
» 17685 Month
» 295481 Year
» 1179862 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 2105 m/e 08/1915
BR 32105 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer L. Billinton
Class E2
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 08/1915
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/09/1962
Scrapping During 10/1962
Service Life 47 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAT Stewarts Lane 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73B Bricklayers Arms 9w/e 12/06/1957
75C Norwood Junction 6w/e 22/10/1959
71A Eastleigh 8w/e 17/01/1961
71I Southampton Docks m/e 08/12/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 15/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms q/e 11/06/1957
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 9w/e 22/10/1959
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 17/01/1961
ALLOC 71I Southampton Docks 4w/e 08/12/1961
WDN   w/e 15/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1915 To Service To service as SR Number 2105
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 32105    
12/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
22/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
17/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
08/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Southampton Docks (71I)    
15/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 32105    

prev prev