|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/03/1961 | Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) | Works Yard: 32107, 34078, 35007/26, 76059/62. Erecting Shop: D2274, D3465, E5004/6/17, 15233, 30106, 30254, 30501/6/13/20, 30667, 30863, 32300, 32662, 34062/96/7, 34108, 35016/7/20, 41318, 73019, 73117, 75066/71, 76007/65, 80018/43/81, 82015, Longmoor Military Rly. 600. Behind Boiler Shop: 15202/28, 30826. Scrap Road: 30031, 30128. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1916 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 2107 Built at Brighton Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT) | ||
10/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 32107 | ||
12/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
22/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) | ||
10/03/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Southampton Docks (71I) | ||
25/02/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 32107 | ||
03/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped |