Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1883 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19686 Week
» 72702 Month
» 192229 Year
» 3219082 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2108 |
m/e |
07/1916 |
British Railways |
32108 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
L. Billinton |
Class |
E2 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 07/1916 |
Withdrawal |
During 06/1961 |
Service Life |
44 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
2w/e |
10/06/1953 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
24/08/1953 |
REINS |
74C |
Dover Marine |
6w/e |
18/11/1953 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
6w/e |
30/12/1953 |
REINS |
71A |
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
17/12/1956 |
ALLOC |
71I |
Southampton Docks |
5w/e |
25/01/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/07/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1953 |
Class E2 |
Class 'E2' consists of 10 0-6-0 4 ft. 6 in. shunting tanks introduced by Col. Billinton on the L.B.S.C.R. in 1913. The last five have extended tanks and were built in 1915-6. They are used almost invariably for yard or very local shunting and empty trip duties based on Battersea (Stewarts Lane) and Dover depots. For one to be seen out in the country hauling a train is most unusual but No. 32108 while on passage from Eastleigh to Dover worked an empty wagon train from Eastbourne to Hastings; then, after spending the night at St. Leonards shed, double-headed the morning Hastings-Ashford goods with Bulleid 'Ql' Q-6-0, 33027! |
SLS/195304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1916 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2108 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32108 |
|
|
17/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
25/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southampton Docks (71I) |
|
|
06/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32108 |
|
|
07/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|