Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 168 Today
» 1008 Yesterday
» 6323 Week
» 16493 Month
» 294289 Year
» 1178670 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 2112 m/e 04/1877
BR 32112 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stroudley
Class Black Tanks
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 04/1877
Withdrawal Sat 17/12/1949
Scrapping During 02/1950
Service Life 72 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SOT Southampton Docks 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn 17/12/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BM Bournemouth 8w/e 08/01/1949
ALLOC BAS Basingstoke 6w/e 12/12/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1877 To Service To service as SR Number 2112
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southampton Docks (SOT)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 32112 but not taken up    
12/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 2112    

prev prev