Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 711 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 4532 Week
» 21868 Month
» 299664 Year
» 1184045 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 2133 m/e 12/1878
BR 32133 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stroudley
Class Black Tanks
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 12/1878
Withdrawal During 12/1952
Scrapping During 12/1952
Service Life 74 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ELH Eastleigh 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71I Southampton Docks 6w/e 20/03/1951
71I Southampton Docks 4w/e 12/05/1951
71I Southampton Docks 4w/e 19/03/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71I Southampton Docks 6w/e 14/03/1951
LOAN 71I Southampton Docks 5w/e 08/10/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1878 To Service To service as SR Number 2133
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 32133 but not taken up    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southampton Docks (71I)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southampton Docks (71I)    
19/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southampton Docks (71I)    
12/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 2133    

prev prev