Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 766 Today
» 5975 Yesterday
» 6741 Week
» 105386 Month
» 308050 Year
» 3334903 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2145 |
m/e |
10/1879 |
British Railways |
32145 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stroudley |
Class |
Black Tanks |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 10/1879 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 02/06/1951 |
Service Life |
71 yrs, 8 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1951 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
02/06/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/08/1948 |
Southampton Docks |
At the end of August only four Class 'B.4' 0-4-OT's remained here, viz: Nos. 81 an 85 stored at the old Docks shed, and Nos. 97 an 147 stored in an old fruit warehouse near the Ocean Dock coaling stage in the old Docks. The goods shunting is monopolised by the ex U.S.A. 0-6-0T's. The following are now lettered British Railways:-Nos. S64, S73, 30066, 30067 an 30072. Of these, No. 30072 has Gill Sans lettering and a smoke-box numberplate. Other locomotives in this area with Gill Sans lettering and smoke-box numberplates have included Nos. 30276 ('G.6'), 30567 ('0395') and 32145 ('E.1') |
SLS/194810 |
16/06/1951 |
Brighton Works |
On 16th June, the shops contained s1, 15212, 31470, 31801, 31920, 32343, 32442, 32501/7, 32557 all under repair, remains of 32145 an 2063, while 32005 is next for scrap (possibly to be followed by 2595, which was at the shed). New 2-6-4T No. 80010 was well advanced and four more should be finished by mid-August. Boilers are numbered BR5-896 upwards and are pressed to 225lb. Now that No. 2063 is cut up, the B4 class is extinct. A small private exhibition of locomotives took place in the Works on 19th June, consisting of 42095, 34040 Crewkerne (both in spotless condition), 15227, and the almost-completed 2-6-4T 80010. On that date the diesel s1 was renumbered 15201, completing the class. |
SLS/195108 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1879 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2145 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32145 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
06/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
02/06/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32145 |
|
|