Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 164 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17967 Week
» 70983 Month
» 190510 Year
» 3217363 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2239 |
m/e |
01/1882 |
British Railways |
32239 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stroudley |
Class |
D1M |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
To Service |
During 01/1882 |
Withdrawal |
During 03/1948 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1882 |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
03/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ELHW |
|
8w/e |
31/05/1947 |
ALLOC |
ELHW |
|
on |
22/07/1947 |
WDN |
HIT |
Hither Green |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1882 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2239 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co. |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2239 |
|
|
05/1948 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 32239 but not taken up |
|
|