Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 352 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14395 Week
» 79349 Month
» 282013 Year
» 3308866 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2378 |
m/e |
05/1893 |
British Railways |
32378 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Bogie Tanks |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 05/1893 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 07/08/1952 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1952 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STL |
St Leonards |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
6w/e |
14/03/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/08/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/06/1950 |
Brighton Works |
New construction: 4-6-2 34110; 2-6-4T 42097-42166, the first three being in a forward stage. 42096 came out early in July and bears a Brighton date plate, 1950. In for repair: 0-6-OT 515S; 0-6-2T 32460, 32594; 4-4-2T 32083; 2-6-0 32347; 2-8-0 77030, 77108, 77359; 4-6-2 34036, 34045 Ottery St. Mary, 34038 Lynton, 34082 615 Squadron. 34036 will probably now receive its name-plates Westward Ho!: this was the engine which was fitted to burn oil on the Laidlaw-Drew method till September 1948, when it was re-converted at Eastleigh to burn coal: for some reason the plates were not then affixed. The 'D.3' 32378 compares unfavourably in appearance with others of the class, as it is painted unlined black without even the usual emblem: on the other hand 32386 is kept in good condition, and the lining and emblem make it look attractive. The class 'G.6' tank recently repaired at Brighton has not been renumbered 30272 as anticipated, but is now DS3152 with tanks lettered -Engineer's Dept.' Meldon Quarry.' There is no mention of British Railways on the tanks. B.O.B. 34074 is now named 46 Squadron. Engines going through Brighton shops hitherto have been very thoroughly brought into line with latest ideas as to lettering, etc., but 'R.1' bogie tank 31706 has had SOUTHERN replaced by the B.R. totem, yet still retaining the green shaded numerals on the bunker. The side tanks only have been repainted. |
SLS/195008 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2378 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (STL) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32378 |
|
|
14/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
20/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
1952 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
07/08/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32378 |
|
|