Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 127 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17930 Week
» 70946 Month
» 190473 Year
» 3217326 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2388 |
m/e |
05/1894 |
British Railways |
32388 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Bogie Tanks |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 05/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 15/12/1951 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 7 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1952 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STL |
St Leonards |
6w/e |
26/09/1949 |
ALLOC |
75G |
Eastbourne |
6w/e |
14/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
74E |
St Leonards |
5w/e |
08/10/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
15/12/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/01/1950 |
Ashford Works |
Locomotives in Works on 3/1 included Nos. 1266/67/93, 1309/24, 1553, 31610. 1623/72, 31729, 1783/93, 31806, 1807, 31831/63, 1864. Locomotives ex Works (late December-early January) painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 31145, 31811/38, 32465. 32585. 'D.3' No. 32380 is expected to appear in lined black, as also have Nos. 32388/93 recently, so it would appear that complete extinction of this class is not at present contemplated. |
SLS/195002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2388 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD) |
|
|
26/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (STL) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32388 |
|
|
14/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G) |
|
|
20/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G) |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
08/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
15/12/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32388 |
|
|
1952 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|