Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2042 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19845 Week
» 72861 Month
» 192388 Year
» 3219241 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2443 |
m/e |
06/1893 |
British Railways |
32443 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Marsh |
Class |
Large Vulcans |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
To Service |
During 06/1893 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 27/08/1960 |
Service Life |
67 yrs, 2 mths , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1947 |
Brighton Works |
: No. 21C156 Croydon and 'Austerity' 77122 have just been through shops; the former has the new pattern cab and longer deflector plates. Engines in shops in mid-November were 21C126 (new deflectors and old cab-off 21C156), 21C170 Manston fully painted), 680S, 1414, 1826/80, 2022, 2039 Hartland Point, 2083/9, 2153, 2339/66, 2436/43/55/62/89/90, 2523/46/75. For the first time for many months the shops are without an 'Austerity' and old Brighton types preponderate. It is interesting to point out that the name Croydon was borne by Rennie's 0-4-2 of 1838 (London and Croydon Ry. No. 2), but apart from this engine-which became S.E.R. No. 2 as from 31/1/1846-three engines of this name have been seen on Brighton metals as follows: Craven's 2-2-2 No. 128 which was commenced by Dodds & Son of Rotherham in 1866 and finished off at Brighton Works in June, 1871, and named Croydon by Mr. Stroudley: scrapped in 1888. Stroudley's 0-4-2 No. 181, built at Brighton (estd. Works No. 463), completed early in 1890 by R. J. Billinton, and scrapped in 1929. Bulleid's 'West Country' Class No. 21C156, completed in February, 1947, and modified in November to the 'Battle of Britain' Class (estd. Works No. 1004). |
SLS/194712 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2443 Built at Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32443 |
|
|
27/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
25/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
08/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
14/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
13/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
27/08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32443 |
|
|
10/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|