Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 170 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17973 Week
» 70989 Month
» 190516 Year
» 3217369 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2534 |
m/e |
10/1900 |
British Railways |
32534 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Marsh |
Class |
Large Vulcans |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
To Service |
During 10/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 30/09/1961 |
Service Life |
61 yrs |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NHN |
Newhaven |
m/e |
30/11/1946 |
ALLOC |
EBN |
Eastbourne |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
5w/e |
31/10/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/10/1945 |
Ashford Works |
Locos noted on 27/10 included 0-4-0 Dock Tank 81, 'Jersey,' together with Terrier 2678, both ex-works. The latter has been on loan to. the KESR. 2528 (BTN), 2534 (NHN), 2023/5 (TWW) and 719 (BM) were outside the shed whilst 2072 (NX) was on a down passenger. 1451 with number still on the tender was station pilot. 22 classes in all were represented, excluding those outside the works. |
SLS/194602 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2534 Built at Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newhaven (NHN) |
|
|
01/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (EBN) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32534 |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
30/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32534 |
|
|
10/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|