Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 570 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 13976 Week
» 66992 Month
» 186519 Year
» 3213372 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2571 |
m/e |
12/1902 |
British Railways |
32571 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Large Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1902 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/01/1956 |
Service Life |
53 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1956 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
75E |
Three Bridges |
8w/e |
19/03/1952 |
TOSTORE |
75B |
Redhill |
8w/e |
03/03/1953 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
24/08/1953 |
REINS |
75B |
Redhill |
10w/e |
10/12/1953 |
TOSTORE |
75E |
Three Bridges |
6w/e |
30/12/1953 |
TOSTORE |
75E |
Three Bridges |
6w/e |
22/06/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/01/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/02/1951 |
Eastbourne stored locomotives |
Actually stored at Eastbourne on 15th February: I.lx Nos. 32005, 2009, 2595, 2603; E.5 Nos. 32571/88; B.4 Nos. 2054/62/3/8; B.4x Nos. 32043, 2052/5, 2060, 32071/2/3 (17 locos.). |
SLS/195103 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2571 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Horsham (HOR) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32571 |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastbourne (75G) |
|
|
19/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
20/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Redhill (75B) |
|
|
10/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
18/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
14/01/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32571 |
|
|
02/1956 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|